TN SB1712 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the West Fork Drakes Creek dam and reservoir interstate authority to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the West Fork Drakes Creek dam and reservoir interstate authority to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-03-19SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0625)
2020-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0625)
2020-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020
2020-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/26/2020
2020-01-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1790 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback