TN SB1710 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Medical Cannabis Act"; establishes medical cannabis commission for regulation of cannabis-related health care. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Medical Cannabis Act"; establishes medical cannabis commission for regulation of cannabis-related health care. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 50; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
2018-01-24SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1749 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback