TN SB1708 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, consolidates provisions governing earthquake and fire drills. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, consolidates provisions governing earthquake and fire drills. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1765 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration