TN SB1707 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Hunger-Free Students Act"; clarifies that state board of education rules that permit schools to impose sanctions against students owing a school debt do not authorize sanctions against students owing a meal debt. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Hunger-Free Students Act"; clarifies that state board of education rules that permit schools to impose sanctions against students owing a school debt do not authorize sanctions against students owing a meal debt. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1690 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning