TN SB1692 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prevents an inmate convicted of a felony from using sentence reduction credits until the minimum release eligibility date applicable to the inmate is reached. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, prevents an inmate convicted of a felony from using sentence reduction credits until the minimum release eligibility date applicable to the inmate is reached. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1514 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee