TN SB1691 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows any LEA, rather than just the Metropolitan Nashville public school system, using the career academy or small learning community model to extend career and technical education (CTE) class sizes in grades nine through 12; allows an LEA to seek a waiver from the commissioner of education to extend the CTE class size average in grades nine through 12. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, allows any LEA, rather than just the Metropolitan Nashville public school system, using the career academy or small learning community model to extend career and technical education (CTE) class sizes in grades nine through 12; allows an LEA to seek a waiver from the commissioner of education to extend the CTE class size average in grades nine through 12. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669 | |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1569 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 669