TN SB1689 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the number of credits, from three to four, a student in a work-based learning program can earn in a year; reduces the number of hours of supervised work experience, from 10 to five, required for a student in a work-based learning program to earn one additional credit; reduces the number of hours of supervised work experience, from 20 to five, required for a student in a work-based learning program to earn additional credits. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 9, relative to work-based learning programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2098 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee