TN SB1680 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires information contained in an application for licensure as a locksmith to be posted on the department of commerce and insurance website within 30 calendar days of the date a license is either granted or refused. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11 and Title 62, Chapter 32.
Title
As introduced, requires information contained in an application for licensure as a locksmith to be posted on the department of commerce and insurance website within 30 calendar days of the date a license is either granted or refused. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11 and Title 62, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1790 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-30 - P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Subcommittee