TN SB1671 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the assessor, upon application of an owner of property that qualifies for federal low-income housing tax credits, to value the property based on actual income derived from the property without consideration of any value attributable to the low-income housing tax credits. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires the assessor, upon application of an owner of property that qualifies for federal low-income housing tax credits, to value the property based on actual income derived from the property without consideration of any value attributable to the low-income housing tax credits. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1390 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-08 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to TACIR