TN SB1670 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that each LEA employee who works directly with students in the LEA, instead of only teachers, be trained at least once every three years on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 1021 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0864) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0864) |
2022-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-02-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/9/2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2341 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021