TN SB1667 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates separate offense of felon in possession of handgun and instead applies offense of felon in possession of firearm to felons possessing handguns; establishes that person convicted of nonviolent felony, including felony drug offense, does not commit offense of felon in possession of firearm if person has had conviction expunged or has had rights of citizenship fully restored. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, eliminates separate offense of felon in possession of handgun and instead applies offense of felon in possession of firearm to felons possessing handguns; establishes that person convicted of nonviolent felony, including felony drug offense, does not commit offense of felon in possession of firearm if person has had conviction expunged or has had rights of citizenship fully restored. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1718 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee