TN SB1657 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adopts the interstate compact to elect the president by national popular vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adopts the interstate compact to elect the president by national popular vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 15.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
2016-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
2016-03-22SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2016-02-16SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
2016-02-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1728 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback