TN SB1654 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 306 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 306 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended by Chapter 451 of the Private Acts of 1953; Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 1955; Chapter 248 of the Private Acts of 1957; Chapter 249 of the Private Acts of 1957; Chapter 26 of the Private Acts of 1963; Chapter 188 of the Private Acts of 1969; Chapter 141 of the Private Acts of 1977; Chapter 182 of the Private Acts of 1980; Chapter 140 of the Private Acts of 1986; Chapter 155 of the Private Acts of 1988; Chapter 158 of the Private Acts of 1994; Chapter 117 of the Private Acts of 1998; Chapter 126 of the Private Acts of 1998; Chapter 11 of the Private Acts of 2003; Chapter 75 of the Private Acts of 2008; Chapter 61 of the Private Acts of 2010; Chapter 65 of the Private Acts of 2012; Chapter 80 of the Private Acts of 2014 and Chapter 8 of the Private Acts of 2015; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter for the City of Westmoreland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 33 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-04 - Pr. Ch. 33