TN SB1652 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Pursuant to the request of Richard City and Deptford Independent School District, authorizes the district to issue bonds and notes in an amount not to exceed $2,350,000. - Amends Chapter 93 of the Private Acts of 1920; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 93 of the Private Acts of 1920; as amended by Chapter 740 of the Private Acts of 1925; Chapter 540 of the Private Acts of 1939; Chapter 136 of the Private Acts of 1949; Chapter 91 of the Private Acts of 1959; Chapter 36 of the Private Acts of 1999; Chapter 148 of the Private Acts of 2000; Chapter 104 of the Private Acts of 2004 and Chapter 21 of the Private Acts of 2005; and any other acts amendatory thereto, to authorize and empower the Richard City and Deptford Independent School District to issue up to $2,350,000 of school bonds and notes; and to provide for the pledge, levy and collection of taxes to pay debt service on said bonds and notes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1632 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-04 - Pr. Ch. 35