TN SB1650 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires approval by the governing body of each local government in which a proposed user fee facility is located prior to development of the facility; removes authority of the department of transportation to expend funds from the transportation modernization fund to develop a user fee facility. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Section 12-2-112; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Section 12-2-112; Title 54 and Title 55, relative to the development of user fee facility projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1612 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee