TN SB1642 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to the law concerning governmental entities, supported in whole or in part by the general assembly, purchasing services or commodities from the central nonprofit agency that works to provide individuals with severe disabilities competitive integrated employment opportunities. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 71, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, makes changes to the law concerning governmental entities, supported in whole or in part by the general assembly, purchasing services or commodities from the central nonprofit agency that works to provide individuals with severe disabilities competitive integrated employment opportunities. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 71, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 782 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0657) |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0476) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2075 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782