TN SB1637 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the trial court vacancy commission to June 30, 2030. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4, relative to the trial court vacancy commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 536
2024-02-26SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024
2024-02-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/21/2024
2024-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1780 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/07/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback