TN SB1631 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the period in which a vote of a county commissioner having a conflict of interest can be challenged; requires county mayor to call a special meeting if the challenged vote would change the outcome of the vote. - Amends TCA Section 5-5-112.
Title
As introduced, extends the period in which a vote of a county commissioner having a conflict of interest can be challenged; requires county mayor to call a special meeting if the challenged vote would change the outcome of the vote. - Amends TCA Section 5-5-112.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1570 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee