TN SB1627 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, reduces the number of readings required for the passage of ordinances by the board of mayor and aldermen, from three to two; authorizes the employment of a city administrator. - Amends Chapter 417 of the Private Acts of 1915; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACTto amend Chapter 417 of the Private Acts of 1915; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 50 of the Private Acts of 1979; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter for the Town of Troy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 4 | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Pr. Ch. 4