TN SB1625 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires the clerk or authorized collector of the county pulpwood severance tax to audit pulpwood operators at least once a year and to report the results of such audits to the county legislative body on a quarterly basis; requires operators to maintain records from the previous three years of operation necessary to determine the amount of the tax due to the county. - Amends Chapter 55 of the Private Acts of 1997.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 55 of the Private Acts of 1997; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the pulpwood severance tax in Benton County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16 | |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1604 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 16