TN SB1624 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits alterations to a student's transcript unless the LEA, charter school, or virtual school has a written policy governing transcript alterations; prohibits an LEA from retaliating against an employee who brings unauthorized transcript alterations to the attention of school officials; provides penalty for violation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 50 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, prohibits alterations to a student's transcript unless the LEA, charter school, or virtual school has a written policy governing transcript alterations; prohibits an LEA from retaliating against an employee who brings unauthorized transcript alterations to the attention of school officials; provides penalty for violation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 50 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 557 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1527 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Pub. Ch. 557