TN SB1622 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the issuance of electronic citations, and not just written citations on paper, for certain misdemeanor criminal offenses in lieu of arrest. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the issuance of electronic citations, and not just written citations on paper, for certain misdemeanor criminal offenses in lieu of arrest. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 781 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 65, Nays 19, PNV 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0489) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1611 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 781