TN SB1622 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to inform LEAs before each school year if sufficient funds have been appropriated to pay the cost of the required college entrance examination for students who want to take the examination a second time. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to inform LEAs before each school year if sufficient funds have been appropriated to pay the cost of the required college entrance examination for students who want to take the examination a second time. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1980 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning