TN SB1617 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the offense of mail theft, which is intentionally obtaining mail from another person's mailbox or premises without the consent of the addressee and with the intent to deprive the addressee of the mail. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, creates the offense of mail theft, which is intentionally obtaining mail from another person's mailbox or premises without the consent of the addressee and with the intent to deprive the addressee of the mail. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1625 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee