TN SB1615 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to the provisions governing labor rates charged by motor vehicle dealers. - Amends TCA Section 55-17-121.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-17-121, relative to obligations under warranties and recalls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 277 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0185) |
2021-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0117) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1352 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 277