TN SB1614 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the health facilities commission to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to the health facilities commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-03 Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
2024-04-03 Pub. Ch. 597
2024-03-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2024-03-19SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2024-03-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-03-18SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-03-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-03-14HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 0
2024-03-14HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2024-02-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2024-02-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2024-02-12SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2024-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/12/2024
2024-02-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-01-31SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/7/2024
2024-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1757 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 597

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback