TN SB1611 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 891
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 891
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines industrial hemp under the Tennessee Right to Farm Act, and revises other provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Title
As enacted, redefines industrial hemp under the Tennessee Right to Farm Act, and revises other provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 891 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2032 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 891