TN SB1609 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 30 to 20 days following the availability of sufficient data, the period within which a historic zoning commission or regional historic zoning commission must grant or deny a request for a certificate of appropriateness. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to public planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee