TN SB1609 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits denying certain durable medical equipment providers the right to participate in a health plan or denying a beneficiary of a health plan the right to select certain durable medical equipment providers in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits denying certain durable medical equipment providers the right to participate in a health plan or denying a beneficiary of a health plan the right to select certain durable medical equipment providers in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2045 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed for lack of second in: Insurance and Banking Subcommittee