TN SB1604 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school to provide age-appropriate instruction to public school students in kindergarten through grade 12 on the events of September 11, 2001, annually on September 11. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school to provide age-appropriate instruction to public school students in kindergarten through grade 12 on the events of September 11, 2001, annually on September 11. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1559 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration