TN SB1602 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires TACIR to conduct a study on factors affecting the financial burden on relative caregivers caused by the opioid crisis, along with other issues pertaining to relative caregivers, and provide a report with findings and any recommendations to the general assembly no later than January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires TACIR to conduct a study on factors affecting the financial burden on relative caregivers caused by the opioid crisis, along with other issues pertaining to relative caregivers, and provide a report with findings and any recommendations to the general assembly no later than January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1563 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback