TN SB1600 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires physicians or other medical professionals working in a hospital who make a diagnosis of, or prescribe for, injuries resulting from the use of a vapor product to report the case to the department; requires the department to annually report on the number of persons suffering injuries resulting from the use of a vapor product. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires physicians or other medical professionals working in a hospital who make a diagnosis of, or prescribe for, injuries resulting from the use of a vapor product to report the case to the department; requires the department to annually report on the number of persons suffering injuries resulting from the use of a vapor product. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1700 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee