TN SB1598 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state agencies to retain a record of the number of any license holders who receive electronic notification of their license renewals. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, requires state agencies to retain a record of the number of any license holders who receive electronic notification of their license renewals. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee