TN SB1597 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates ambulance service as an essential service, directs all county governing bodies to make provisions to ensure that at least one licensed ambulance service is available within their county, authorizes municipal governing bodies to make provisions for ambulance service within the boundaries of a municipality, and authorizes the governing body of any county or city to adopt and enforce reasonable regulations to control the provision of private or nonprofit ambulance service. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 61 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 61 and Title 68, relative to ambulance service.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 212 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0065) |
2021-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0038) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0719 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 212