TN SB1590 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases, from 10 to 30, the number of days an owner of utility facilities located in a state highway right-of-way has to respond to a second relocation notice, and the number of days an owner has to file the reservation of rights notice with the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases, from 10 to 30, the number of days an owner of utility facilities located in a state highway right-of-way has to respond to a second relocation notice, and the number of days an owner has to file the reservation of rights notice with the department of transportation. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-03-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendment #1
2020-03-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendment #2
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0682)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0670)
2020-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-12HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-10SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-03-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0563)
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020
2020-03-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1604 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback