TN SB1587 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 947 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA1230) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1193) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1192) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1125) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA1116) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1105) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am. as am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1020) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1078) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Motion to reconsider Am. #1 as am. adopted. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Motion to reconsider Am. #2 adopted. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Motion to reconsider Am. #3 adopted. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1105) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1078) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am. as am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1020) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 1 - SA1117) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1485 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947