TN SB1586 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provision governing allocation of sales and use tax revenue to certain commercial development districts in economically distressed counties by clarifying that a county bordering three such distressed counties for purposes of the allocation must have bordered at least three such counties in three fiscal years since fiscal year 2016-2017, if certain requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to economically distressed counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 561 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 5/3/21 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1042 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021