TN SB1584 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands eligibility for permanent sport combination hunting and fishing licenses to include residents of this state who have suffered an amputation of 75 percent or more of a lower limb. - Amends TCA Section 70-2-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 70-2-104, relative to licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 385 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0071) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1230 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 385