TN SB1577 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows TCRS members who served in the armed forces during certain periods of armed conflict to establish retirement credit for the military service under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605.
Title
As introduced, allows TCRS members who served in the armed forces during certain periods of armed conflict to establish retirement credit for the military service under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-605.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1577&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1577.pdf |