TN SB1576 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from $2.93 billion to $4 billion, the maximum aggregate principal amount for which the agency may issue bonds and notes at any one time. - Amends TCA Section 13-23-121.
Title
As enacted, increases, from $2.93 billion to $4 billion, the maximum aggregate principal amount for which the agency may issue bonds and notes at any one time. - Amends TCA Section 13-23-121.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766 | |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1622 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 766