TN SB1575 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises law concerning safekeeping of prisoners in nearby jails. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As enacted, revises law concerning safekeeping of prisoners in nearby jails. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Sen. Thelma Harper [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1045 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2106 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1045