TN SB1573 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a local governmental entity or the executive head of a local government from, by executive order, ordinance, or resolution, creating categories or classes of nonessential businesses, trades, professions, or industries for the purpose of suspending lawful commerce, encumbering trade, or denying citizens the right to work if such activities are otherwise lawful in this state unless an explicit order of the local fire marshal or a court of competent jurisdiction declares that the business operating poses a clear and present danger to the citizenry of this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to the right to work.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 384 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 19, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0170) |
2021-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0153) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0037 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 384