TN SB1571 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to issue state identification cards, which serve as proof that the holder is authorized to carry a firearm as law enforcement, to inmate relations coordinators and correctional officers who have completed the appropriate probationary period established by the department of correction, rather than only to those who are vested. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to issue state identification cards, which serve as proof that the holder is authorized to carry a firearm as law enforcement, to inmate relations coordinators and correctional officers who have completed the appropriate probationary period established by the department of correction, rather than only to those who are vested. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 599 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/28/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2023 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 599