TN SB1569 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the sale or purchase of an assault weapon as a Class A misdemeanor; defines assault weapon. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 36-3-625; Section 38-3-119; Title 39 and Section 40-14-109.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 36-3-625; Section 38-3-119; Title 39 and Section 40-14-109, relative to restricting certain types of firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Desk for Introduction |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1579 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1569&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB1569.pdf |