TN SB1569 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates sunrise provision for newly adopted physical therapy licensure compact, to terminate June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates sunrise provision for newly adopted physical therapy licensure compact, to terminate June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Pub. Ch. 803
2018-05-04 Effective date(s) 04/24/2018
2018-04-24SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-12HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-12HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-02-26HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
2018-01-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1661 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback