TN SB1568 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits a sexual offender to reside, conduct an overnight visit, or be alone with the offender's child unless the offender's parental rights have been or are being terminated or any minor or adult child of the offender was a victim of the sexual offense committed by the offender. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits a sexual offender to reside, conduct an overnight visit, or be alone with the offender's child unless the offender's parental rights have been or are being terminated or any minor or adult child of the offender was a victim of the sexual offense committed by the offender. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-12-23SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1583 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback