TN SB1567 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, subject to certain exemptions, that a sale or transfer of a firearm be done through a federally licensed gun dealer; creates a Class B misdemeanor offense for sales or transfers that are not conducted through a gun dealer. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 38-3-119 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 38-3-119 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to the transfer of firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Desk for Introduction |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1576 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-10 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1567&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB1567.pdf |