TN SB1567 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that non-compliance with state and federal anti-discrimination laws is not included in the definition of "illegal activities" as it relates to provisions prohibiting retaliatory termination of an employee. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29 and Title 50, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20; Title 29 and Title 50, Chapter 1, relative to employee rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 556
2021-05-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 5/4/2021
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0943 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 556

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback