TN SB1566 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 928
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that educational institutions exempt from registering with the division of charitable solicitations, includes institutions that are approved by the local board of education, the ASD, or the state board of education; extends certain renewal of registration filings for an additional 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that educational institutions exempt from registering with the division of charitable solicitations, includes institutions that are approved by the local board of education, the ASD, or the state board of education; extends certain renewal of registration filings for an additional 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 928
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-04-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-13HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-04-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-04-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2016-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/4/2016
2016-03-29SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2016-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
2016-02-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2016-01-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/2/2016
2016-01-14SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1979 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 928

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback