TN SB1562 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, authorizes the board of mayor and aldermen to appoint and remove all directors and department heads, upon majority vote; and replaces the town manager with the board as the appointing authority for the town recorder. - Amends Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Chapter 167 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended by Chapter 39 of the Private Acts of 2020; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the Town of Oakland.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
2023-04-05SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1571 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback